This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/24/2021 at 23:18:50 (UTC).

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC -vs- WHITE, TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against WHITE, TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1844

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC

THE BOARDWALK APARTMENTS

BOARDWALK 13TH LP

Defendant

WHITE, TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G

1 Se 1St Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

08/04/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

CHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK; PAYEE NAME: PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (BOARDWALK 13TH LP DBA THE BOARDWALK APARTMENTS); AMOUNT TO BE PAID: $500.00

07/27/2021: CHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK; PAYEE NAME: PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (BOARDWALK 13TH LP DBA THE BOARDWALK APARTMENTS); AMOUNT TO BE PAID: $500.00

STIPULATION FOR IMMEDIATE REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT

07/20/2021: STIPULATION FOR IMMEDIATE REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT

ORDER STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO CDC DECLARATION

07/09/2021: ORDER STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO CDC DECLARATION

EVIDENCE CONTROL FORM WITH ATTACHED EVIDENCE - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

07/08/2021: EVIDENCE CONTROL FORM WITH ATTACHED EVIDENCE - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

RECEIPT FOR RENT PAID INTO COURT REGISTRY (SRL)

07/01/2021: RECEIPT FOR RENT PAID INTO COURT REGISTRY (SRL)

CORONAVIRUS DIAGNOSIS (SRL)

06/30/2021: CORONAVIRUS DIAGNOSIS (SRL)

NOTICE OF FILING; - EXHIBITS 1-4

06/24/2021: NOTICE OF FILING; - EXHIBITS 1-4

FAX CONFIRMATION SHEET SHOWING ORDER GRANTING STAY WAS FAXED TO ALACHUA COUNTY SHERIFF'S CIVIL BUREAU

06/23/2021: FAX CONFIRMATION SHEET SHOWING ORDER GRANTING STAY WAS FAXED TO ALACHUA COUNTY SHERIFF'S CIVIL BUREAU

EVICTION PROTECTION DECLARATION ( SRL); TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED J, JA, BB 06/23/2021-KBH)

06/23/2021: EVICTION PROTECTION DECLARATION ( SRL); TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED J, JA, BB 06/23/2021-KBH)

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION WITH DIRECTIONS TO SHERIFF AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STOP EVICTION 7/2/2021 @ 3:00 PM

06/23/2021: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION WITH DIRECTIONS TO SHERIFF AND ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STOP EVICTION 7/2/2021 @ 3:00 PM

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNISSUED PER THE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY

06/22/2021: WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNISSUED PER THE ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS POSTED ; 6/3/2021 AS TO TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE

06/08/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS POSTED ; 6/3/2021 AS TO TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE

MOTION TO STOP EVICTION FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE (DEFENDANT);

06/09/2021: MOTION TO STOP EVICTION FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE (DEFENDANT);

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

05/27/2021: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 470400 Date: 05/28/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/27/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 470400 Date: 05/28/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/27/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 470400 Date: 05/28/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/27/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 470400 Date: 05/28/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 06/23/2021; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketPayments from Registry; Amount: $500.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHECK REQUEST PROCESSED BY CLERK; PAYEE NAME: PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (BOARDWALK 13TH LP DBA THE BOARDWALK APARTMENTS); AMOUNT TO BE PAID: $500.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DISBURSING MONEY TO PLAINTIFF IMMEDIATELY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketUNSIGNED PROPOSED DOCUMENT; ; CHECK REQUEST - REGISTRY OF COURT; Sent on: 07/22/2021 13:00:49.04

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR IMMEDIATE REGISTRY DISBURSEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER STAYING CASE PURSUANT TO CDC DECLARATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVIDENCE CONTROL FORM WITH ATTACHED EVIDENCE - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 471750; Paid: $520.00; Applied: $515.00; Refunded: $5.00

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO STOP EVICTION FILED BY SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL); TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCOPIES FEE -(CASE RECEIPTING) NON COURT DOCUMENT Receipt: 470833 Date: 06/09/2021; Amount: $5.10; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS POSTED ; 6/3/2021 AS TO TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS/COMPLAINT (6/02/2021 - KBH); TANZERMEAKA QUANTAVIOUS WHITE (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $715.10; Total Fee Paid: $715.10; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470400; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 470400 Date: 05/28/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 470400 Date: 05/28/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC AS AGENT is a litigant

Latest cases where Boardwalk Apartments is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G