Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:00:46 (UTC).

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC -vs- FISHER, KELLY MARIE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against FISHER, KELLY MARIE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1019

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC

Defendant

FISHER, KELLY MARIE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G

1 Se 1St Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

04/06/2021: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICITION SUMMONS - 03/26/2021

03/30/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICITION SUMMONS - 03/26/2021

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MARIE FISHER ; Receipt: 467654 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/22/2021: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MARIE FISHER ; Receipt: 467654 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO KELLY MARIE FISHER (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

03/24/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO KELLY MARIE FISHER (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF FILING; - CDC DECLARATION EXECUTED BY KELLY MARIE FISHER

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF FILING; - CDC DECLARATION EXECUTED BY KELLY MARIE FISHER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 467654 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/22/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 467654 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 03/22/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5-DAY EVICITION SUMMONS - 03/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO KELLY MARIE FISHER (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467654; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO KELLY MARIE FISHER ; Receipt: 467654 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; - CDC DECLARATION EXECUTED BY KELLY MARIE FISHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 467654 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC AS AGENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G