This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/10/2020 at 15:12:15 (UTC).

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (THE -vs- TRULUCK, ALEXANDRA et al

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC THE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against TRULUCK, ALEXANDRA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2172

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (THE

Defendants

TRULUCK, REESE

Gainesville, FL 32608

TRULUCK, ALEXANDRA

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G.

1 Se 1St Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT ; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/20/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT ; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

06/20/2018: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALEXANDRA TRULUCK; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/20/2018: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALEXANDRA TRULUCK; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: RESSE TRULUCK; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/20/2018: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: RESSE TRULUCK; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO ALEXANDRA TRULUCK

06/22/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO ALEXANDRA TRULUCK

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; AS TO REESE TRULUCK

06/22/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; AS TO REESE TRULUCK

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 6/26/2018; ALEXANDRA TRULUCK

06/27/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 6/26/2018; ALEXANDRA TRULUCK

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 6/26/2018; REESE TRULUCK

06/27/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 6/26/2018; REESE TRULUCK

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE

07/09/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND FOR MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION ENTERED 7/9/2018 AS TO: ALEXANDRIA TRULUCK & REESE TRULUCK / CMW

07/09/2018: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND FOR MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION ENTERED 7/9/2018 AS TO: ALEXANDRIA TRULUCK & REESE TRULUCK / CMW

MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

07/09/2018: MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT I) (CLOSES)

07/13/2018: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT I) (CLOSES)

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 7/17/2018

07/17/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 7/17/2018

MAIL RETURNED; ALEXANDRA TRULUCK (DEFENDANT);

10/01/2018: MAIL RETURNED; ALEXANDRA TRULUCK (DEFENDANT);

MAIL RETURNED; REESE TRULUCK (DEFENDANT);

10/01/2018: MAIL RETURNED; REESE TRULUCK (DEFENDANT);

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; REESE TRULUCK (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; ALEXANDRA TRULUCK (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 7/17/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/20/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT I) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND FOR MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION ENTERED 7/9/2018 AS TO: ALEXANDRIA TRULUCK & REESE TRULUCK / CMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 6/26/2018; REESE TRULUCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 6/26/2018; ALEXANDRA TRULUCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; AS TO REESE TRULUCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; AS TO ALEXANDRA TRULUCK

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 421215; Paid: $205.00; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $205.00; Total Fee Paid: $205.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: RESSE TRULUCK; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALEXANDRA TRULUCK; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT ; Receipt: 421215 Date: 06/21/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC AS AGENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G