This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 08/25/2021 at 08:13:29 (UTC).

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC COLLEGE -vs- SILVA, MAGGIE CECILIA

Case Summary

On 06/22/2021 PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC COLLEGE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SILVA, MAGGIE CECILIA. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2053

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC COLLEGE

Defendant

SILVA, MAGGIE CECILIA

Gainesville, FL 32603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.

1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

07/22/2021: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

NOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

07/15/2021: NOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

07/08/2021: MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

RESPONSE LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO 5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT, SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

06/30/2021: RESPONSE LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO 5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT, SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED 6/24/2021 TO MAGGIE CECILIA SILVA

06/30/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED 6/24/2021 TO MAGGIE CECILIA SILVA

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS/COMPLAINT (06/24/2021-KBH); AS TO MAGGIE CECILIA SILVA

06/24/2021: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS/COMPLAINT (06/24/2021-KBH); AS TO MAGGIE CECILIA SILVA

5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAGGIER CECILIA SILVA; Receipt: 471328 Date: 06/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/21/2021: 5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAGGIER CECILIA SILVA; Receipt: 471328 Date: 06/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ; ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

06/21/2021: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ; ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

06/21/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ; Receipt: 471328 Date: 06/23/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/21/2021: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ; Receipt: 471328 Date: 06/23/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2021
  • DispositionEVICTION RESIDENTIAL POSSESSION ONLY OR WITH DAMAGES UP TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/22/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING ACTION (CLOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE LETTER FROM DEFENDANT TO 5 DAY EVICTION SUMMONS FILED BY DEFENDANT, SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT (SRL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS SERVED 6/24/2021 TO MAGGIE CECILIA SILVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING SUMMONS/COMPLAINT (06/24/2021-KBH); AS TO MAGGIE CECILIA SILVA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 471328; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED TO MAGGIER CECILIA SILVA; Receipt: 471328 Date: 06/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ; ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION ; Receipt: 471328 Date: 06/23/2021; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC AS AGENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.