This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/12/2020 at 17:25:57 (UTC).

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (COLLEGE -vs- BENEDETI, ROGER

Case Summary

On 10/18/2018 PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC COLLEGE filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BENEDETI, ROGER. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3853

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC (COLLEGE

Defendant

BENEDETI, ROGER

Gainesville, FL 32603

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G

1 Se 1St Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 427480 Date: 10/18/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/18/2018: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 427480 Date: 10/18/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

10/18/2018: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 427480 Date: 10/18/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/18/2018: 5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 427480 Date: 10/18/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO ROGER BENEDETI (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

10/22/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO ROGER BENEDETI (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS-POSTED 10/24/2018; ROGER BENEDETI (DEFENDANT);

10/24/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS-POSTED 10/24/2018; ROGER BENEDETI (DEFENDANT);

MAIL RETURNED; ROGER DENEDETI

10/31/2018: MAIL RETURNED; ROGER DENEDETI

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE

11/01/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND FOR MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION ENTERED 11/1/2018 AS TO: ROGER BENEDETI / CMW

11/01/2018: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND FOR MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION ENTERED 11/1/2018 AS TO: ROGER BENEDETI / CMW

MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

11/01/2018: MOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT I) (CLOSES)

11/02/2018: JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT I) (CLOSES)

WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 11/6/2018

11/06/2018: WRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 11/6/2018

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

11/14/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

MAIL RETURNED; ROGER BENEDETI

11/16/2018: MAIL RETURNED; ROGER BENEDETI

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; ROGER BENEDETI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED EXECUTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION - ISSUED 11/6/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/18/2018; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT I) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION AND FOR MOTION FOR ISSUANCE OF JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION & DEFAULT AS TO COUNT I FOR EVICTION ENTERED 11/1/2018 AS TO: ROGER BENEDETI / CMW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; ROGER DENEDETI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS-POSTED 10/24/2018; ROGER BENEDETI (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING AS TO ROGER BENEDETI (SUMMONS/COMPLAINT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 427480; Paid: $195.00; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 427480 Date: 10/18/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - DELINQUENT TENANT Receipt: 427480 Date: 10/18/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARADIGM PROPERTIES MANAGEMENT TEAM INC AS AGENT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQUIRE, JOHN G