Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/06/2020 at 14:36:02 (UTC).

PALACIO, NAILEN -VS- TERZA, MATHEW J et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2017 PALACIO, NAILEN filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against TERZA, MATHEW J. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3647

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PALACIO, NAILEN

Defendants

TERZA, MATHEW J

Gainesville, FL 32606

BUGICA, VIVIAN

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCLAUGHLIN ESQ, ANDREW J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 100 Ne 5 Ave Suite A2

Delray Beach, FL 33483

Defendant Attorney

BAKER ESQ, AARON R

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 390 North Orange Ave Suite 895

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

EXHIBITS

10/31/2018: EXHIBITS

EXHIBITS

10/31/2018: EXHIBITS

TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION

10/31/2018: TRANSCRIPT OF DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO ADD A CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

10/31/2018: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND THE COMPLAINT TO ADD A CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING -

10/29/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF HEARING -

DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/23/2018: DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/19/2018: DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/19/2018: DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/19/2018: DEFENDANT(S) NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION RELATING TO EXPERT WITNESS

10/02/2018: DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION RELATING TO EXPERT WITNESS

NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANTS

08/31/2018: NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT INTERROGATORIES UPON DEFENDANTS

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

08/28/2018: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

07/16/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

03/05/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANTS VERIFIED ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES DATED DECEMBER 20, 2017

01/23/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF FILING ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S AUTOMOBILE INTERROGATORIES DATED DECEMBER 20, 2017

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

12/20/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/20/2017: DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

12/20/2017: ANSWER TO COMPLAINT

101 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/01/2017; Disposition: A. HRG OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT(S) CANCELLATION NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF DEFENDANTS PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' PRETRIAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketHEARING DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND TO ADD A CLAIM FOR PUNITIVE DAMAGES AND ORDER DENYING MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
97 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 409752; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409752 Date: 11/02/2017; VIVIAN BUGICA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409752 Date: 11/02/2017; MATHEW J TERZA (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, MATTHEW J TERZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INITIAL INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT VIVIAN BUGICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST REQUEST OR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT MATTHEWJ TERZA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT VIVIAN BUGICA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 409752 Date: 11/02/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less