Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/10/2020 at 19:15:01 (UTC).

PADGETT, THOMAS -VS- QUIROS, AMY FRIEDLANDER et al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2018 PADGETT, THOMAS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against QUIROS, AMY FRIEDLANDER. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1501

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PADGETT, THOMAS

Defendants

MORALES QUIROS, JOHNNY JESUS

QUIROS, AMY FRIEDLANDER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GLASSMAN, DANIEL J

804 Nw 16Th Ave #B

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

11/02/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

ORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

10/31/2018: ORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

10/31/2018: NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF

10/25/2018: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/22/2018: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/22/2018: RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

10/08/2018: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF THOMAS PADGETT

09/19/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF THOMAS PADGETT

DEFENDENT AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCT

09/13/2018: DEFENDENT AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS' OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL REQUEST TO PRODUCT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS

09/07/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEEFNDANT JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS

09/07/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEEFNDANT JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION

08/28/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

08/24/2018: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SOCIAL MEDIA REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF THOMAS PADGETTS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS

08/24/2018: PLAINTIFF THOMAS PADGETTS NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO DEFENDANT JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

06/26/2018: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES #1-3 TO PLAINTIFF

06/26/2018: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES #1-3 TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF FOR DOWNLOAD OF SOCIAL MEDIA ACCOUNT

06/26/2018: DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF FOR DOWNLOAD OF SOCIAL MEDIA ACCOUNT

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/09/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/09/2018; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PROPOUNDING FIRST SUPPLEMENTAL INTERROGATORY TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS AND JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY ELECTRONIC E-MAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED ON 5/16/2018; AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED ON 5/16/2018; JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 418932; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 418932 Date: 05/09/2018; AMY FRIEDLANDER QUIROS (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 418932 Date: 05/09/2018; JOHNNY JESUS MORALES QUIROS (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 418932 Date: 05/09/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GLASSMAN, DANIEL J