This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/06/2020 at 02:06:47 (UTC).

OCHSENIUS JR, BORIS RODRIGO -VS- YOON, SUK JAN et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2017 OCHSENIUS JR, BORIS RODRIGO filed a Property - Repossession lawsuit against YOON, SUK JAN. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3487

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Repossession

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCHSENIUS JR, BORIS RODRIGO

Defendants

MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC

C/O Dolores Pampillo Diaz Ra, 14107 Nw 148 Place

Alachua, FL 32615

YOON, SUK JAN

Gainesville, FL 32606

MILLENIUM TOTAL AUTO CARE

C/O Dolores Pampillo Diaz Ra, 14107 Nw 148 Place

Alachua, FL 32615

YOON, HAE SOOK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorney

FABIANI II ESQ, RICHARD H

726 Ne 1 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

01/16/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

ORDER CANCELLING SHOW CAUS HEARING AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

11/30/2017: ORDER CANCELLING SHOW CAUS HEARING AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - UNSERVED; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC (DEFENDANT);

11/16/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - UNSERVED; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC (DEFENDANT);

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

11/15/2017: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; SUK JAN YOON (DEFENDANT);

11/06/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; SUK JAN YOON (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; HAE SOOK YOON (DEFENDANT);

11/06/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; HAE SOOK YOON (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC (DEFENDANT);

10/26/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; (3 CC TO PL ATTY M: 10/24/17-SRW)

10/23/2017: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; (3 CC TO PL ATTY M: 10/24/17-SRW)

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; SUK JAN YOON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; SUK JAN YOON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC, MILLENIUM TOTAL AUTO CARE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC, MILLENIUM TOTAL AUTO CARE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; HAE SOOK YOON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/18/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; HAE SOOK YOON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/18/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

10/18/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/18/2017: COMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2018
  • DispositionREPLEVIN; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/18/2017; Disposition: B. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELLING SHOW CAUS HEARING AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - UNSERVED; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; SUK JAN YOON (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; HAE SOOK YOON (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; (3 CC TO PL ATTY M: 10/24/17-SRW)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 409194; Paid: $515.00; Applied: $515.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $515.00; Total Fee Paid: $515.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; SUK JAN YOON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; MILLENIUM GROUP TOTAL AUTO CARE LLC, MILLENIUM TOTAL AUTO CARE (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; HAE SOOK YOON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR REPLEVIN Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • DocketREPLEVIN FEE/ATTACHMENT FEE Receipt: 409194 Date: 10/20/2017; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F