This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 17:55:58 (UTC).

OBI, MICHAEL C et al -VS- NELSON, DEANNA

Case Summary

On 05/17/2021 OBI, MICHAEL C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NELSON, DEANNA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1640

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

M D MOVERS AND MORE LLC

3514 Se 21St Ave

Gainesville, FL 32641

Defendant

NELSON, DEANNA

Gainesville, FL 32653

Counter Defendants

M & D MOVERS AND MORE LLC

3514 Se 21St Avenue

Gainesville, FL 32641

MICHAEL C OBI ET AL

Gainesville, FL 32641

Counter Plaintiff

NELSON, DEANNE

Gainesville, FL 32653

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO PLAINTIFF / COUNTER-DEFENDANT FROM CLERK ADVISING THE JUDGMENT HAS BEEN SATISFIED (MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES 1/31/2022/CMW)

01/31/2022: LETTER TO PLAINTIFF / COUNTER-DEFENDANT FROM CLERK ADVISING THE JUDGMENT HAS BEEN SATISFIED (MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES 1/31/2022/CMW)

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND NOTIFICATION OF PAYMENT INTO THE REGISTRY OF COURT; ; County - Satisfaction of FJ & Pmnt to Registry; Sent on: 01/26/2022 15:32:25.75

01/26/2022: SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND NOTIFICATION OF PAYMENT INTO THE REGISTRY OF COURT; ; County - Satisfaction of FJ & Pmnt to Registry; Sent on: 01/26/2022 15:32:25.75

JUDGMENT PAYOFF / SATISFACTION WORKSHEET FOR CIVIL

01/26/2022: JUDGMENT PAYOFF / SATISFACTION WORKSHEET FOR CIVIL

LETTER TO DEFENDANT REGARDING PAYMENT - (COULD NOT MAIL TO DEFENDANT AS ADDRESS CURRENTLY ON FILE IS A BAD ADDRESS & COULD NOT EMAIL AS A PERMISSION TO USE EMAIL HAS NOT BEEN FILED - CMW 1/18/2022)

01/18/2022: LETTER TO DEFENDANT REGARDING PAYMENT - (COULD NOT MAIL TO DEFENDANT AS ADDRESS CURRENTLY ON FILE IS A BAD ADDRESS & COULD NOT EMAIL AS A PERMISSION TO USE EMAIL HAS NOT BEEN FILED - CMW 1/18/2022)

REQUEST FOR JUDGEMENT PAYOUT

01/18/2022: REQUEST FOR JUDGEMENT PAYOUT

EVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

12/15/2021: EVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

IMAGE UNAVAILABLE DOCKETED IN ERROR

12/15/2021: IMAGE UNAVAILABLE DOCKETED IN ERROR

FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

12/14/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

MAIL RETURNED; DEANNA NELSON (DEFENDANT);

11/05/2021: MAIL RETURNED; DEANNA NELSON (DEFENDANT);

DAMAGES TO DEFENDANT'S HOUSEHOLD GOODS

10/26/2021: DAMAGES TO DEFENDANT'S HOUSEHOLD GOODS

SUFFERED DAMAGES CAUSED BY BREACH OF MOVING CONTRACT

10/26/2021: SUFFERED DAMAGES CAUSED BY BREACH OF MOVING CONTRACT

EXHIBIT LIST

10/22/2021: EXHIBIT LIST

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED 10/21/2021 AS TO ULAME PRINCE ERESE

10/22/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED 10/21/2021 AS TO ULAME PRINCE ERESE

RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED 10/21/2021 AS TO DEOSHA LATORIA OBI

10/22/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE ON SUBPOENA SERVED 10/21/2021 AS TO DEOSHA LATORIA OBI

COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF DEOSHA LATORIA OBI

10/20/2021: COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF DEOSHA LATORIA OBI

COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF ULAME PRINCE ERESE

10/20/2021: COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF ULAME PRINCE ERESE

SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL-ISSUED AS TO DEOSHA OBI; (RTN TO PLAINTIFF 10/20/2021-SRW)

10/20/2021: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL-ISSUED AS TO DEOSHA OBI; (RTN TO PLAINTIFF 10/20/2021-SRW)

SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL-ISSUED AS TO ERESE ULAME PRINCE; (RTN OT PLAINTIFF 10/20/2021-SRW)

10/20/2021: SUBPOENA FOR TRIAL-ISSUED AS TO ERESE ULAME PRINCE; (RTN OT PLAINTIFF 10/20/2021-SRW)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO PLAINTIFF / COUNTER-DEFENDANT FROM CLERK ADVISING THE JUDGMENT HAS BEEN SATISFIED (MAILED TO BOTH PARTIES 1/31/2022/CMW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT AND NOTIFICATION OF PAYMENT INTO THE REGISTRY OF COURT; ; County - Satisfaction of FJ & Pmnt to Registry; Sent on: 01/26/2022 15:32:25.75

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT PAYOFF / SATISFACTION WORKSHEET FOR CIVIL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialReceipt # 480299; Paid: $220.00; Applied: $218.95; Refunded: $1.05

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPOSTAGE ; Receipt: 480299 Date: 01/24/2022; Amount: $7.38; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketPREPARATION OF DOCUMENT FEE ; Receipt: 480299 Date: 01/24/2022; Amount: $7.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketRECORDING FEE - FIRST PAGE ; Receipt: 480299 Date: 01/24/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketREGISTRY OF COURT SERVICE FEE ; Receipt: 480299 Date: 01/24/2022; Amount: $5.67; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketREGISTRY OF COURT DEPOSIT ; Receipt: 480299 Date: 01/24/2022; Amount: $188.90; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt # 480018; Paid: $7.00; Applied: $7.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT / CLERK TO RESET FOR PRETRIAL / CONTINUED FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE AN AMENDED STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketCOPIES FEE -(CASE RECEIPTING) NON COURT DOCUMENT Receipt: 471766 Date: 07/02/2021; Amount: $1.80; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 06/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO THE CLAIM FILED AGAINST ME BY M & D MOVERS/MICHAEL C OBI (SRL) DEANNA NELSON(DEFENDANT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - SUMMONS ISSUED; Event: SMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS ; Date: 07/02/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $840.20; Total Fee Paid: $840.20; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 469798; Paid: $320.00; Applied: $311.80; Refunded: $8.20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketCOPIES FEE -(CASE RECEIPTING) NON COURT DOCUMENT Receipt: 469798 Date: 05/17/2021; Amount: $1.80; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 469798 Date: 05/17/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 469798 Date: 05/17/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less