Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/12/2020 at 16:59:07 (UTC).

NISTAL, GISELA -VS- STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 10/16/2018 NISTAL, GISELA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3456

  • Filing Date:

    10/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NISTAL, GISELA

Defendants

STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY

LAMB, JENNIE E

High Springs, FL 32643

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BAGEN ESQ, KYLE J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, Po Box 5757

Gainesville, FL 32627

Defendant Attorneys

FANCHER ESQ, JASON

1301 Riverplace Blvd, Ste 1904

Jacksonville, FL 32207

SCOTT ESQUIRE, LORI C

901 N Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/08/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

03/08/2019: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

02/07/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

02/07/2019: ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT

DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/31/2018: DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/20/2018: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, GISELA NISTAL'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

12/20/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF, GISELA NISTAL'S INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/19/2018: PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/14/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

11/27/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNINSURED/UNDERINSURED MOTORIST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

11/15/2018: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNINSURED/UNDERINSURED MOTORIST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

11/14/2018: DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO CO-DEFENDANT JENNIE E LAMB

11/14/2018: DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS TO CO-DEFENDANT JENNIE E LAMB

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

11/13/2018: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

(UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; JENNIE E LAMB (DEFENDANT);

11/05/2018: (UNSIGNED) SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; JENNIE E LAMB (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 427405 Date: 10/17/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/16/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 427405 Date: 10/17/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

10/16/2018: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

10/16/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DispositionAUTO NEGLIGENCE; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/16/2018; Disposition: B. HRG/SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AS TO SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM AS TO STATE FARM - SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT STATE FARM'S NOTICE OF CANCELLING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF PLIANTIFF GISELA NISTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMAIL FROM MELINDA S CRROMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT STATE FARM'S NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF PLAINTIFF'S PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; STATE FARM MUTUAL AUTOMOBILE INSURANCE COMPANY (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 427405 Date: 10/17/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; JENNIE E LAMB (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 427405 Date: 10/17/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, JENNIE E LAMB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 427405 Date: 10/17/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BAGEN ESQ, KYLE J