This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 07/11/2020 at 16:34:24 (UTC).

NETTLETON, CREE R -vs- TAYLOR, JOSHUA J et al

Case Summary

On 06/12/2020 NETTLETON, CREE R filed an Other lawsuit against TAYLOR, JOSHUA J. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1612

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Criminal Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NETTLETON, CREE R

Defendants

TAYLOR, JOSHUA J

Gainesville, FL 32608

TAYLOR, JAIME F

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRASHEAR ESQ, BRUCE

925 Nw 56 Terr Ste C

Gainesville, FL 32605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 06/26/2020 AS TO: JAIME F. TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 06/26/2020 AS TO: JOSHUA J. TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JAIME F. TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: JOSHUA J. TAYLOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $420.00; Total Fee Paid: $420.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • FinancialReceipt # 456404; Paid: $420.00; Applied: $420.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO) & J.K. "BUDDY" IRBY IS NO LONGER THE CLERK; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE)\u201d; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 6/12/2020); Receipt: 456404 Date: 06/12/2020; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE; ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO) & J.K. "BUDDY" IRBY IS NO LONGER THE CLERK; GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE)\u201d; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 6/12/2020); Receipt: 456404 Date: 06/12/2020; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 456404 Date: 06/12/2020; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRASHEAR ESQ, BRUCE