This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2022 at 16:48:20 (UTC).

NCB MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC -vs- GROVER, MATTHEW

Case Summary

On 03/22/2022 NCB MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC filed an Other lawsuit against GROVER, MATTHEW. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1023

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NCB MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC

Defendant

GROVER, MATTHEW

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAYERS ESQ, BREANNE

Attorney at ANDREU, PALMA, LEVIN & SOLIS, PLLC

Andreu, Palma, Levin & Solis, Pllc, 887 Donald Ross Road

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT COUNTY OTHER UP TO $15,000 Receipt: 482826 Date: 03/23/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/21/2022: (E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT COUNTY OTHER UP TO $15,000 Receipt: 482826 Date: 03/23/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

03/21/2022: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 482826 Date: 03/23/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/21/2022: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 482826 Date: 03/23/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/21/2022: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/21/2022: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

03/28/2022: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 4/9/2022; MATTHEW GROVER (DEFENDANT);

04/11/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 4/9/2022; MATTHEW GROVER (DEFENDANT);

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SERVED 4/9/2022; MATTHEW GROVER (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 482826; Paid: 482826; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 482826 Date: 03/23/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) COMPLAINT COUNTY OTHER UP TO $15,000 Receipt: 482826 Date: 03/23/2022; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NCB Management Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAYERS , BREANNA