This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/18/2023 at 09:21:17 (UTC).

MILLHOPPER STATIONS SOUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION -VS- REED, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 MILLHOPPER STATIONS SOUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against REED, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4832

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MILLHOPPER STATIONS SOUTH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Defendant

REED, MICHAEL

Gainesville, FL 32653

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495187 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/28/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495187 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES ANS COSTS

12/28/2022: MOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES ANS COSTS

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 495187 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/28/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 495187 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED SUBSTITUTE 1/11/2023; MICHAEL REED (DEFENDANT);

01/13/2023: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED SUBSTITUTE 1/11/2023; MICHAEL REED (DEFENDANT);

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED SUBSTITUTE 1/11/2023; MICHAEL REED (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495187; Paid: 495187; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 02/17/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 495187 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES ANS COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495187 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less