Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 02:51:29 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC -VS- GANEY, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GANEY, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0659

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

Defendant

GANEY, JENNIFER

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OBI ESQ, VALERIA

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

RUMALLA ESQ, P BOBBY

2537 Southeast 17Th Street

Ocala, FL 34471

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION (CLOSES)

04/13/2018: STIPULATION (CLOSES)

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW.

04/13/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW.

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/12/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR IN COURT IN THE FORM; OF A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY

03/29/2018: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR IN COURT IN THE FORM; OF A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 03/21/2018

03/21/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 03/21/2018

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 415095 Date: 02/26/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/26/2018: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 415095 Date: 02/26/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/26/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 415095 Date: 02/26/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/26/2018: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 415095 Date: 02/26/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COVER LETTER

02/26/2018: COVER LETTER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $500.01 TO $2500.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 02/26/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR IN COURT IN THE FORM; OF A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 03/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 415095; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 04/13/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: FERRERO - DIV IV, DENISE R Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 415095 Date: 02/26/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($500.01 - $2500.00) Receipt: 415095 Date: 02/26/2018; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer RUMALLA ESQ, P BOBBY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer OBI , VALERIA