This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/03/2022 at 23:09:50 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC -VS- WEIS, BRYAN

Case Summary

On 06/03/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WEIS, BRYAN. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1892

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

WEIS, BRYAN

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WESEMAN ESQ, MELANIE S

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

06/03/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

06/03/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/03/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470629 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/03/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470629 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470629 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

06/03/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470629 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

06/07/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; BRYAN WEIS (DEFENDANT);

07/26/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; BRYAN WEIS (DEFENDANT);

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. CONT FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET - FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. (***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***)

07/30/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. CONT FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET - FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. (***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***)

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERFENCE

08/17/2021: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERFENCE

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

10/01/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

10/14/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 06/03/2021; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 10/01/2021 Time: 11:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERFENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. CONT FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET - FRIDAY, OCTOBER 1, 2021 AT 11:00 A.M. (***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; BRYAN WEIS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470629; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL; Receipt: 470629 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/30/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470629 Date: 06/04/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WESEMAN , MELANIE S