This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/28/2022 at 09:34:06 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC -VS- STIRIZ, RUSSELL

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STIRIZ, RUSSELL. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4194

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

STIRIZ, RUSSELL

Gainesville, FL 32653

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHATANI ESQ, PAYAL

P O Box 2121

Warren, MI 48090

GREEN ESQ, JOHAN A

Po Box 2121

Warren, MI 48090

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 493220 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 493220 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493220 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: (ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493220 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/10/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

12/16/2022: COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

12/16/2022: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE ON SUMMONS

12/12/2022: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE ON SUMMONS

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR IN COURT FILED AS A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY - ANTHONY GARRETT, ESQ COVERAGE COUNSEL FOR PRETRIAL

12/16/2022: AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR IN COURT FILED AS A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY - ANTHONY GARRETT, ESQ COVERAGE COUNSEL FOR PRETRIAL

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/21/2022: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

12/27/2022: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR IN COURT FILED AS A NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY - ANTHONY GARRETT, ESQ COVERAGE COUNSEL FOR PRETRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 03/03/2023 Time: 11:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION OF NON SERVICE ON SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493220; Paid: 493220; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 12/16/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493220 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 493220 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHATANI , PAYAL

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GREEN, JOHAN ALEXI