This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/01/2023 at 13:45:19 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC -VS- LOMBRES, JUDYLYN

Case Summary

On 11/18/2022 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LOMBRES, JUDYLYN. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4329

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

LOMBRES, JUDYLYN

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

CHATANI ESQ, PAYAL

P O Box 2121

Warren, MI 48090

GREEN ESQ, JOHAN A

Po Box 2121

Warren, MI 48090

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 493616 Date: 11/18/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/18/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 493616 Date: 11/18/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/18/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493616 Date: 11/18/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/18/2022: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493616 Date: 11/18/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/18/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/08/2022: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

12/16/2022: COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY

12/16/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, ALACHUA COUNTY

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

12/16/2022: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE; JUDYLYN LOMBRES (DEFENDANT);

12/16/2022: DECLARATION OF NON SERVICE; JUDYLYN LOMBRES (DEFENDANT);

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

12/27/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

01/10/2023: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE

01/10/2023: PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE

COVER LETTER

01/10/2023: COVER LETTER

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION ; OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

01/12/2023: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION ; OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION ; OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

01/12/2023: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION ; OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

01/13/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/18/2022; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION ; OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION ; OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 03/03/2023 Time: 11:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: EVENT CANCELLED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493616; Paid: 493616; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 12/16/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 493616 Date: 11/18/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 493616 Date: 11/18/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less