Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:03:01 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC -VS- LENAHAN, PATRICIA

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LENAHAN, PATRICIA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1024

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

LENAHAN, PATRICIA

Gainesville, FL 32607

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PALMA ESQ, JORGE L

815 Nw 57 Ave Ste 401

Miami, FL 33126

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 04/08/2021; PATRICIA LENAHAN (DEFENDANT);

04/08/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 04/08/2021; PATRICIA LENAHAN (DEFENDANT);

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/06/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 467698 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/23/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 467698 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/22/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

03/22/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 467698 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/22/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 467698 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 04/08/2021; PATRICIA LENAHAN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467698; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/07/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 467698 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 467698 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Palma, Jorge L, ESQ.