Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:19:39 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC -VS- CASEY, HEATHER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CASEY, HEATHER. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0699

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

CASEY, HEATHER

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRELL ESQ, ELIZABETH

P.O. Box 23200

Louisville, KY 40223

Defendant Attorney

WELLS ESQ, MARILYN G

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF MARILYN G WELLS, PLLC

The Law Office Of Marilyn G Wells, Pllc, 2064 Park St

Jacksonville, FL 32204

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNYE FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

03/17/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNYE FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

03/02/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 466662 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/26/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 466662 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 466662 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 466662 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/25/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNYE FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 466662 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 04/09/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466662; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 466662 Date: 02/25/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FERRELL, ELIZABETH MURANTE