Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:03:53 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC -VS- ALVAREZ, YAMILKA LAGO

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALVAREZ, YAMILKA LAGO. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1028

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

ALVAREZ, YAMILKA LAGO

Miami, FL 33187

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FITZPATRICK ESQ, MOLLY

Po Box 290335

Tampa, FL 33687

 

Court Documents

ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

04/06/2021: ORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

04/02/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

03/22/2021: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 467667 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/22/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 467667 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/22/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 467667 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/22/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 467667 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - UNSERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467667; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 467667 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/07/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) ; Receipt: 467667 Date: 03/23/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FITZPATRICK, MOLLY KATHLEEN