Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/03/2020 at 01:29:06 (UTC).

MERIDIAN BEHAVORIAL HEALTHCARE INC -VS- PELLETT, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2017 MERIDIAN BEHAVORIAL HEALTHCARE INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PELLETT, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1300

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERIDIAN BEHAVORIAL HEALTHCARE INC

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

PELLETT, MICHAEL

Gainesville, FL 32605

3Rd Party Defendants

BLUM SCHUMACHER & ASSOCIATES INC

Blum Schumacher & Associates Inc, C/O Richard R Blum, Ra, 14260 W Newberry Rd #247

Newberry, FL 32669

NIX ENGINEERING INC

C/O Ronald J Nix Ra, 2711 Nw 6Th St Ste B

Gainesville, FL 32609

OCI ASSOCIATES INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRICE ESQ, JEFFREY L.

5216 Sw 91 Dr

Gainesville, FL 32608

Defendant Attorney

BROWN ESQ, CURTIS L

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 505 Maitland Ave Suite 1000

Altamonte Springs, FL 32701

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

KRESS ESQ, DOUGLAS J

11410 N Jog Road Ste 100

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33418

KATZ ESQ, MITCHELL

5850 Coral Ridge Dr Ste 201, Heron Bay Corporate Center

Coral Springs, FL 33076

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PELLETT

12/15/2017: RESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PELLETT

OBJECTION TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, OCI ASSOCIATES, INC.'S FIRST EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF, MICHAEL PELLETT

11/13/2017: OBJECTION TO THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, OCI ASSOCIATES, INC.'S FIRST EXPERT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF, MICHAEL PELLETT

THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PELLETT

11/13/2017: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT/THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PELLETT

THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF MERIDIAN BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE INC

11/13/2017: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF MERIDIAN BEHAVIORAL HEALTHCARE INC

THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, OCI ASSOCIATES, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

10/30/2017: THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT, OCI ASSOCIATES, INC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

10/23/2017: AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/16/2017: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

10/11/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

COVER LETTER FILED

10/10/2017: COVER LETTER FILED

COPY OF SUMMONS AS TO NIX ENGINEERING FILED

10/10/2017: COPY OF SUMMONS AS TO NIX ENGINEERING FILED

ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM (NON-PROPERTY) Receipt: 408407 Date: 10/03/2017; Amount: $395.00; Amount Due: $0.00

10/03/2017: ANSWER AND COUNTERCLAIM (NON-PROPERTY) Receipt: 408407 Date: 10/03/2017; Amount: $395.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

09/28/2017: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

EXHIBITS

08/24/2017: EXHIBITS

NOTICE OF HEARING -

08/23/2017: NOTICE OF HEARING -

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 4/18/17 AS TO; MICHAEL PELLETT (DEFENDANT);

04/21/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 4/18/17 AS TO; MICHAEL PELLETT (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; MICHAEL PELLETT (DEFENDANT);

04/19/2017: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; MICHAEL PELLETT (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED - AS TO MICHAEL PELLETT; WITH FEE Receipt: 400257 Date: 04/12/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - AS TO MICHAEL PELLETT; WITH FEE Receipt: 400257 Date: 04/12/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COMPLAINT Receipt: 400257 Date: 04/12/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/12/2017: COMPLAINT Receipt: 400257 Date: 04/12/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/12/2017; Disposition: B. HRG OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER CANCELING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERNCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED JOINT REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION/CONTINUATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT REQUEST FOR CANCELLATION/CONTINUATION OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS INSURANCE REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PELLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO THIRD PARTY DEFENDANT OCI ASSOCIATES INCS FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO THIRD PARTY PLAINTIFF MICHAEL PELLETT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORY RESPONSES

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 4/18/17 AS TO; MICHAEL PELLETT (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; MICHAEL PELLETT (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $835.00; Total Fee Paid: $835.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 400257; Paid: $410.00; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - AS TO MICHAEL PELLETT; WITH FEE Receipt: 400257 Date: 04/12/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 400257 Date: 04/12/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERIDIAN BEHAVORIAL HEALTHCARE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BROWN, CURTIS LEE