Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 03/25/2021 at 16:18:27 (UTC).

MCMANN KENNETH W ESTATE OF BY AND THROUGH CAROL -VS- ARCHER HEALTH VENTURES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 MCMANN KENNETH W ESTATE OF BY AND THROUGH CAROL filed an Other lawsuit against ARCHER HEALTH VENTURES LLC. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0526

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MCMANN KENNETH W ESTATE OF BY AND THROUGH CAROL

Defendants

CARLSON, BETTIE J

N Ft Myers, FL 33903

HEALTH CARE MANAGERS INC

C/O Robert D Mead, 2380 Sadler Road Suite 201

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034

ARCHER HEALTH VENTURES LLC

C/O Beverly A Pascoe, 1301 Riverplace Boulevard Suite 1500

Jacksonville, FL 32207

WHEELER, MICHAEL ANDREW

Gainesville, FL 32607

SELL, STEVEN W

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034

SELL JERRIE C REVOCABLE TRUST

C/O Steven W Sells, 2380 Sadler Road Suite 201

Fernandina Beach, FL 32034

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILANDER ESQUIRE, CARL R

1 N Dale Mabry Hwy

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);

03/18/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED; BETTIE J CARLSON (DEFENDANT);

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED; BETTIE J CARLSON (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS ISSUED; STEVEN W SELL (DEFENDANT);

03/09/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED; STEVEN W SELL (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; STEVEN W SELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; STEVEN W SELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; BETTIE J CARLSON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; BETTIE J CARLSON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; HEALTH CARE MANAGERS INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; HEALTH CARE MANAGERS INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; ARCHER HEALTH VENTURES LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; ARCHER HEALTH VENTURES LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; SELL JERRIE C REVOCABLE TRUST (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; SELL JERRIE C REVOCABLE TRUST (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COMPLAINT Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/25/2021: COMPLAINT Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

02/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON SUMMONS - UNSERVED; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; BETTIE J CARLSON (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED; STEVEN W SELL (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 466686; Paid: $462.50; Applied: $462.50; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $462.50; Total Fee Paid: $462.50; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; MICHAEL ANDREW WHEELER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; STEVEN W SELL (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE/ SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE); ; BETTIE J CARLSON (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; HEALTH CARE MANAGERS INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; ARCHER HEALTH VENTURES LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; SELL JERRIE C REVOCABLE TRUST (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketADDITIONAL DEFENDANTS Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $2.50; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 466686 Date: 02/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILANDER, CARL