This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/10/2020 at 23:35:49 (UTC).

MABLE BARNES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY -VS- H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 MABLE BARNES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY filed an Other lawsuit against H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2338

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MABLE BARNES LLC A FLORIDA LIMITED LIABILITY

Defendants

HARRIS JR, ROBERT G

ROBINSON, WILLIAM

H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

COFFEY ESQ, ANDREW M

Attorney at ATTOREY AT LAW

Attorey At Law, 300 E University Ave Suite 110

Gainesville, FL 32601

HAYTER ESQ, JOHN F

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

Defendant Attorney

STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.

1 Se 1 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION TO DISSOLVE AND DISCHARGE DISTRESS BOND

07/22/2019: ORDER ON MOTION TO DISSOLVE AND DISCHARGE DISTRESS BOND

MOTION TO DISSOLVE AND DISCHARGE DISTRESS BOND

07/12/2019: MOTION TO DISSOLVE AND DISCHARGE DISTRESS BOND

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

09/25/2018: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNSERVED; ROBERT G HARRIS JR (DEFENDANT);

09/13/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNSERVED; ROBERT G HARRIS JR (DEFENDANT);

DEFENDANTS H2R RESTUARANT GROUP LLC WILLIAM ROBINSON AND ROBERT HARRIS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

09/11/2018: DEFENDANTS H2R RESTUARANT GROUP LLC WILLIAM ROBINSON AND ROBERT HARRIS ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; WILLIAM ROBINSON (DEFENDANT);

08/31/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; WILLIAM ROBINSON (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 8/22/18; H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED (DEFENDANT);

08/31/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 8/22/18; H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED (DEFENDANT);

20 DAY SUMMONS - UNISSUED AS TO H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED (DEFENDANT);; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - DUPLICATE / SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/13/18 TO SAME DEF)

08/13/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS - UNISSUED AS TO H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED (DEFENDANT);; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - DUPLICATE / SUMMONS ISSUED ON 08/13/18 TO SAME DEF)

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

08/13/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 424091 Date: 08/13/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/10/2018: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE; H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 424091 Date: 08/13/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. REGISTERED AGENT NOT LISTED ON SUMMONS) Receipt: 424091 Date: 08/13/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

08/10/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. REGISTERED AGENT NOT LISTED ON SUMMONS) Receipt: 424091 Date: 08/13/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

WRIT OF DISTRESS RETURNED - POSTED

08/07/2018: WRIT OF DISTRESS RETURNED - POSTED

WRIT OF DISTRESS ISSUED BY JUDGE

08/03/2018: WRIT OF DISTRESS ISSUED BY JUDGE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/01/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

BOND - SURETY

07/23/2018: BOND - SURETY

SUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED -AS TO: H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/19/2018: SUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED -AS TO: H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

WRIT OF DISTRESS UNISSUED; (WRIT PREPARED FOR JUDGE'S SIGNATURE); (07/31/18 - EMAILED TO JUDGE / ELP)

07/19/2018: WRIT OF DISTRESS UNISSUED; (WRIT PREPARED FOR JUDGE'S SIGNATURE); (07/31/18 - EMAILED TO JUDGE / ELP)

COMPLAINT Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

07/19/2018: COMPLAINT Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 445190; Paid: ($22.00); Applied: ($22.00); Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 445187; Paid: $22.00; Applied: $22.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • FinancialReceipt # 445194; Paid: $22.00; Applied: $22.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • DocketSUSPENSE - CIVIL UNCLAIMED PROPERTY 116.21 Receipt: 445194 Date: 10/02/2019; Amount: $22.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • DispositionDISTRESS OR DETAINER; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 07/12/2019; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO DISSOLVE AND DISCHARGE DISTRESS BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISSOLVE AND DISCHARGE DISTRESS BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • DispositionDISTRESS OR DETAINER; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 08/10/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBOND - SURETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 422775; Paid: $517.00; Applied: $517.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $579.00; Total Fee Paid: $579.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketCOURTVIEW CIVIL OVERPAYMENT>$10.00 Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; Amount: $22.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (20 DAY) ISSUED -AS TO: H2R RESTAURANT GROUP LLC A GEORGIA LIMITED, A GEORGIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY (DEFENDANT);; WITH FEE Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; ; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF DISTRESS UNISSUED; (WRIT PREPARED FOR JUDGE'S SIGNATURE); (07/31/18 - EMAILED TO JUDGE / ELP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • DocketDISTRESS FEE Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; Amount: $85.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 422775 Date: 07/20/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STINSON ESQ., KIRSTIN J.