This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2022 at 21:33:41 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC -VS- STEPHENS, LEE

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEPHENS, LEE. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1790

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

STEPHENS, LEE

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVIN ESQ, DESIREE M

887 Donald Ross Rd

Juno Beach, FL 33408

Defendant Attorney

CHURCHILL JR, ROBERT G

902 North Duval St

Tallahassee, FL 32303

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470255 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/25/2021: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470255 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 470255 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/25/2021: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 470255 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/25/2021: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

05/25/2021: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/03/2021: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 6/5/2021; LEE STEPHENS (DEFENDANT);

06/07/2021: RETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 6/5/2021; LEE STEPHENS (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ONTHE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

06/15/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ONTHE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. SET FOR CMC SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. SET FOR CMC SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

07/29/2021: NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

08/20/2021: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

08/20/2021: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/25/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. SET FOR CMC SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 1:30 P.M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL, DENIAL OF CLAIMS ONTHE MERITS AND NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK PREVAILING PARTY ATTORNEY FEES AND NOTICE OF DESIGNATED EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE - SERVED 6/5/2021; LEE STEPHENS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470255; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 470255 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470255 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHURCHILL, ROBERT G JR