This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 04/12/2022 at 16:11:18 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC -VS- KEELS, DAVID

Case Summary

On 03/15/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against KEELS, DAVID. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0951

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

KEELS, DAVID

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROEBUCK ESQ, ANDREA M

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 482542 Date: 03/16/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/15/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 482542 Date: 03/16/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

03/15/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 482542 Date: 03/16/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

03/15/2022: (ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 482542 Date: 03/16/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 3/28/2022; DAVID KEELS (DEFENDANT);

03/29/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 3/28/2022; DAVID KEELS (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/28/2022; (DUPLICATE COPY)

04/07/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/28/2022; (DUPLICATE COPY)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED 03/28/2022; (DUPLICATE COPY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 3/28/2022; DAVID KEELS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 482542; Paid: 482542; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 05/13/2022 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 482542 Date: 03/16/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 482542 Date: 03/16/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less