This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/06/2020 at 16:05:48 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC -VS- FLINCHUM, ROBERT

Case Summary

On 11/07/2017 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against FLINCHUM, ROBERT. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3529

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

FLINCHUM, ROBERT

Newberry, FL 32669

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WHITTEN ESQ, NILES B

1031 Nw 6Th Street F-3

Gainesville, FL 32601

KAMINSKI ESQ, DAVID

806 Douglas Rd, Ste 200

Coral Gables, FL 33134

 

Court Documents

(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $5000.00) Receipt: 409999 Date: 11/07/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/07/2017: (E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $5000.00) Receipt: 409999 Date: 11/07/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

11/07/2017: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

11/07/2017: E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 409999 Date: 11/07/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/07/2017: (ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 409999 Date: 11/07/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

11/07/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

11/15/2017: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNSERVED

11/30/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNSERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL

01/18/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL

PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- MAY 25, 2018 @ 9:30 A.M.; ****JA TO PREPARE ORDER****

01/19/2018: PRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- MAY 25, 2018 @ 9:30 A.M.; ****JA TO PREPARE ORDER****

ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON FRIDAY, MAY 25, 2018 @ 9:30 AM

01/19/2018: ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON FRIDAY, MAY 25, 2018 @ 9:30 AM

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

06/05/2018: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

JUDGES NOTES FILED

06/06/2018: JUDGES NOTES FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGES NOTES FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DispositionMONEY DAMAGES CLAIM $2,500.01 TO $5,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/07/2017; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • HearingPRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF LACK OF SERVICE HRG (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRETRIAL/LACK OF SERVICE ; Date: 05/25/2018 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: JAWORSKI - DIV V, THOMAS M Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SERVE OR DISMISS AND ORDER SETTING CASE FOR CONTINUED PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ON FRIDAY, MAY 25, 2018 @ 9:30 AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS -PLAINTIFF PRESENT/DEFENDANT(S) NO SHOW. CONT. FOR SERVICE ON LOS DOCKET- MAY 25, 2018 @ 9:30 A.M.; ****JA TO PREPARE ORDER****

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF CO-COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - UNSERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 409999; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED) SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL ; Receipt: 409999 Date: 11/07/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 01/19/2018 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: JAWORSKI - DIV V, THOMAS M Location: COURTROOM 2-B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) STATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $5000.00) Receipt: 409999 Date: 11/07/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Niles B Whitten

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID KAMINSKI