This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/16/2023 at 05:24:44 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC -VS- BROWN, VICKIE

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BROWN, VICKIE. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is RAWLS, MESHON T. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4834

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

RAWLS, MESHON T

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

BROWN, VICKIE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOEHLE ESQ, KRISTINA B

PILIUIKO ESQ, OLEKSANDRA

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495209 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/28/2022: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495209 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/28/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 495209 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/28/2022: (ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 495209 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

12/28/2022: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 01/10/2023; VICKIE BROWN (DEFENDANT);

01/10/2023: SHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 01/10/2023; VICKIE BROWN (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

02/20/2023: NOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

02/24/2023: COURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); (MAILED TO DEFENDANT 2/27/2023/CMW)

02/27/2023: ENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); (MAILED TO DEFENDANT 2/27/2023/CMW)

ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS

02/27/2023: ORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS

MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

03/01/2023: MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORIZED AGENT - ATTACHED

03/01/2023: NOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORIZED AGENT - ATTACHED

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

03/01/2023: AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

03/01/2023: NON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

03/06/2023: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/06/2023
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/29/2022; Disposition: DE03 - DEFAULT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNON MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING - AFFIDAVIT OF AUTHORIZED AGENT - ATTACHED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketENTRY OF DEFAULT (SMALL CLAIMS RULES); (MAILED TO DEFENDANT 2/27/2023/CMW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: RAWLS, MESHON T; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT ACTION MEMO PRETRIAL RESULTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN (SC) - SERVED 01/10/2023; VICKIE BROWN (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495209; Paid: 495209; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 02/24/2023 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: RAWLS - DIV IV, MESHON T Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(ISSUED)SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL -WITH FEE Receipt: 495209 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) Receipt: 495209 Date: 12/29/2022; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less