This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2022 at 21:03:07 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC -VS- ATKINS, DERRICK

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ATKINS, DERRICK. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1795

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

ATKINS, DERRICK

Gainesville, FL 32641

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROEBUCK ESQ, ANDREA M

Po Box 952289

Lake Mary, FL 32795

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - ISSUED ; Receipt: 470263 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/25/2021: SUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - ISSUED ; Receipt: 470263 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470263 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/25/2021: STATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470263 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON (SC) SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 6/8/2021

06/08/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON (SC) SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 6/8/2021

SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED; DERRICK ATKINS (DEFENDANT);

06/14/2021: SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED; DERRICK ATKINS (DEFENDANT);

LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/06/2021: LIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

07/16/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

07/20/2021: PRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

PRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

09/17/2021: PRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

09/30/2021: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $501 TO $2500; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/25/2021; Disposition: HH01 - AFTER HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (SC) (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - NO PARTIES PRESENT. ORDER OF DISMISSAL ***JA TO PREPARE ORDER***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - (ISSUED) ALIAS SUMMONS; MAILED TO PL'S ATTY/ DEFENDANT 07/2021-MJP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • HearingSMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE; Judge: VAN VORST, KRISTINE; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 09/17/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result:; ; Result: DISMISSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL RESULTS - ALL PARTIES PRESENT. CONT FOR STIPULATION/SETTLEMENT- FRIDAY, SEPTEMBER 17, 2021 AT 9:30 .M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIMITED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED; DERRICK ATKINS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON (SC) SUMMONS ; SUBSTITUTE SERVED 6/8/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470263; Paid: $185.00; Applied: $185.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $185.00; Total Fee Paid: $185.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/NOTICE TO APPEAR FOR PRETRIAL - ISSUED ; Receipt: 470263 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIALS - NO IMAGE ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:30 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM ($501 - $2500) ; Receipt: 470263 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $175.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LVNV FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROEBUCK , ANDREA M