This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/13/2020 at 01:07:38 (UTC).

LAW OFFICE OF RONALD E SHOLES PA -VS- DYKES, DANA et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2018 LAW OFFICE OF RONALD E SHOLES PA filed a Probate - Trust lawsuit against DYKES, DANA. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3814

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAW OFFICE OF RONALD E SHOLES PA

Attorney At Law, 4981 Atlantic Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Defendants

THE MENTOR NETWORK

3258 Parkside Center Cir

Tampa, FL 33619

NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

C/O Ct Corporation System Ra, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

DISCOVERY HEALTH

Tampa, FL 33619

JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER

C/O Patricia G Johnston Ra, 1405 Nw 13 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES LLC

C/O Jose I Moreno Ra, 240 Nw 76 Drive Ste D

Gainesville, FL 32607

DYKES, DANA

Starke, FL 32091

PHYSICIANS CHOICE LABORATORY

Rock Hill, SC 29730

SHANDS STARKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER

C/O James Salter Ra, 3940 Nw 16 Blvd

Gainesville, FL 32606

STARKE CHIROPRACTIC

Starke, FL 32091

OPTUM

11000 Optum Circle

Eden Prairie, MN 55344

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHOLES, RONALD E.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 4981 Atlantic Blvd

Jacksonville, FL 32207

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE; NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);

06/14/2019: PROOF OF SERVICE; NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/23/2019: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

05/21/2019: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DANA DYKES

05/16/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS ON DEFENDANT DANA DYKES

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; PHYSICIANS CHOICE LABORATORY (DEFENDANT);

05/16/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE; PHYSICIANS CHOICE LABORATORY (DEFENDANT);

FAX COVER SHEET

04/30/2019: FAX COVER SHEET

VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 2/1/2019; THE MENTOR NETWORK FKA DISCOVERY HEALTH

02/05/2019: VERIFIED RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 2/1/2019; THE MENTOR NETWORK FKA DISCOVERY HEALTH

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES LLC (DEFENDANT);

01/30/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES LLC (DEFENDANT);

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER (DEFENDANT);

01/24/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED; JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER (DEFENDANT);

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ; THE MENTOR NETWORK F/K/A DISCOVERY HEALTH

12/05/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ; THE MENTOR NETWORK F/K/A DISCOVERY HEALTH

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES, LLC

12/05/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES, LLC

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: OPTUM

12/05/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: OPTUM

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: DANA DYKES

12/05/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: DANA DYKES

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/14/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/14/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); STARKE CHIROPRACTIC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/14/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); STARKE CHIROPRACTIC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR CORPORATION); SHANDS STARKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/14/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR CORPORATION); SHANDS STARKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR CORPORATION); PHYSICIANS CHOICE LABORATORY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/14/2018: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR CORPORATION); PHYSICIANS CHOICE LABORATORY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • DispositionTRUST LITIGATION; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 11/14/2018; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED MOTION FOR EQUITABLE DISTRIBUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 7/26/19 @ 10AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; STARKE CHIROPRACTIC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES LLC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE; DANA DYKES (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE 6/11/19; OPTUM (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); ALACHUA HEALTH SERVICES LLC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); STARKE CHIROPRACTIC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); OPTUM (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR A CORPORATION); THE MENTOR NETWORK (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR CORPORATION); SHANDS STARKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - THIS IS NOT FOR PERSONAL SERVICE, BUT FOR CORPORATION); PHYSICIANS CHOICE LABORATORY (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE - NOT AN INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS / PLEASE SUBMIT CORRECTED SUMMONS); DANA DYKES (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 428800 Date: 11/14/2018; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Mentor Network Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where SHANDS STARKE REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER INC is a litigant

Latest cases where JOHNSTON CHIROPRACTIC HEALTH CENTER INC is a litigant