This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/11/2023 at 07:18:14 (UTC).

LAMBERT, JOEL -VS- ANDREWS, LEAH

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 LAMBERT, JOEL filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDREWS, LEAH. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0079

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAMBERT, JOEL

Defendant

ANDREWS, LEAH

Sarasota, FL 34231

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BIGGART II ESQ, JAMES G

104 N Main Street Ste 500

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE Receipt: 495580 Date: 01/10/2023; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/06/2023: COMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE Receipt: 495580 Date: 01/10/2023; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

01/06/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

01/06/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 495580 Date: 01/10/2023; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE/ THIS SUMMONS IS MISSING THE CREOLE TRANSLATION); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

01/06/2023: SUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 495580 Date: 01/10/2023; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE/ THIS SUMMONS IS MISSING THE CREOLE TRANSLATION); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT LEAH ANDREWS

01/06/2023: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT LEAH ANDREWS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT LEAH ANDREWS

01/06/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT LEAH ANDREWS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

01/06/2023: CERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

SUMMONS/PERSONAL SERVICE OF AN INDIVIDUAL(CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: AS THE SPANISH ADA ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER IS MISSING; RESUBMIT AS A " CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - MJP

02/07/2023: SUMMONS/PERSONAL SERVICE OF AN INDIVIDUAL(CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: AS THE SPANISH ADA ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER IS MISSING; RESUBMIT AS A " CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - MJP

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS/PERSONAL SERVICE OF AN INDIVIDUAL(CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE: AS THE SPANISH ADA ADDRESS AND TELEPHONE NUMBER IS MISSING; RESUBMIT AS A " CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - MJP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • FinancialReceipt #: 495580; Paid: 495580; Applied: $410.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $410.00; Total Fee Paid: $410.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT LEAH ANDREWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT LEAH ANDREWS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS UNISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 495580 Date: 01/10/2023; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE/ THIS SUMMONS IS MISSING THE CREOLE TRANSLATION); Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR AUTO NEGLIGENCE Receipt: 495580 Date: 01/10/2023; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less