This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/04/2022 at 21:02:48 (UTC).

JONES, CHELSEA et al -VS- BELLAMAY GRAND APTS

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 JONES, CHELSEA filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BELLAMAY GRAND APTS. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is VAN VORST, KRISTINE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1765

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

Judge Details

Judge

VAN VORST, KRISTINE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

JONES, CHELSEA

High Springs, FL 32643

ROBINSON JR, JOSEPH

High Springs, FL 32643

Defendants

BELLAMAY GRAND APTS

Tampa, FL 33607

BELLAMAY GRAND LLC

R/A: Victor W Holcomb, 3203 W Cypress Street

Tampa, FL 33607

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

ROBINSON JR, JOSEPH

High Springs, FL 32643

Counter Plaintiff

BELLAMAY GRAND APTS DBA BELLAMAY GRAND LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Counter Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMSON ESQ, DAVID E

1418 Nw 6 St

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON MOTION TO PERFECT MOTOR VEHICLE OR VESSEL LIEN(S) UNDER SUPPLEMENTARY PROCEEDINGS (AS TO JOSEPH ROBINSON, JR ONLY)

01/24/2022: ORDER ON MOTION TO PERFECT MOTOR VEHICLE OR VESSEL LIEN(S) UNDER SUPPLEMENTARY PROCEEDINGS (AS TO JOSEPH ROBINSON, JR ONLY)

PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE VERIFIED MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERFECT MOTOR VEHICLE OR VESSEL LIEN(S) UNDER SUPPLEMENTARY PROCEEDINGS (AS TO JOSEPH ROBINSON, JR ONLY) (REOPEN)

01/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE VERIFIED MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERFECT MOTOR VEHICLE OR VESSEL LIEN(S) UNDER SUPPLEMENTARY PROCEEDINGS (AS TO JOSEPH ROBINSON, JR ONLY) (REOPEN)

MOTION TO TAX POST JUDGMENT; ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

01/19/2022: MOTION TO TAX POST JUDGMENT; ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN F HAYTER, ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

01/19/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF JOHN F HAYTER, ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

AMENDED WRIT OF EXECUTION- ISSUED; (01/03/2022-SRW)

01/03/2022: AMENDED WRIT OF EXECUTION- ISSUED; (01/03/2022-SRW)

WRIT OF EXECUTION-UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NAMES DO NOT MATCH THE COUNTER CLAIM OR FINAL JUDGMENT)

12/22/2021: WRIT OF EXECUTION-UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NAMES DO NOT MATCH THE COUNTER CLAIM OR FINAL JUDGMENT)

FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

11/02/2021: FINAL JUDGMENT (SC) (CLOSES)

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 10/22/2021 @ 12:30 PM; NON-JURY TRIAL

10/14/2021: NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 10/22/2021 @ 12:30 PM; NON-JURY TRIAL

EVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

10/13/2021: EVIDENCE WORKSHEET - EXHIBITS HOUSED IN VAULT

NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS NUMBERED 1 THROUGH 7 FOR USE AT FINAL HEARING IN THIS CASE (ATTACHED)

10/07/2021: NOTICE OF FILING PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS NUMBERED 1 THROUGH 7 FOR USE AT FINAL HEARING IN THIS CASE (ATTACHED)

ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY

10/07/2021: ORDER COMPELLING DISCOVERY

NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 9/30/2021 @ 11:00 AM; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / ; HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS

09/20/2021: NOTICE SETTING REMOTE HEARING - 9/30/2021 @ 11:00 AM; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE / ; HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS

MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; ; ; (REOPEN)

09/08/2021: MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY; ; ; (REOPEN)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DAVID E WILLIAMSON ESQ on behalf of DEFENDANT

06/07/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DAVID E WILLIAMSON ESQ on behalf of DEFENDANT

ORDER SETTING HYBRID NON-JURY TRIAL; 10/12/2021 @ 10:00 AM

08/23/2021: ORDER SETTING HYBRID NON-JURY TRIAL; 10/12/2021 @ 10:00 AM

FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, CHELSEA JONES

07/30/2021: FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, CHELSEA JONES

NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROBINSON

07/30/2021: NOTICE OF SERVING FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROBINSON

FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROBINSON

07/30/2021: FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF, JOSEPH ROBINSON

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • FinancialReceipt # 480301; Paid: $50.00; Applied: $50.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON MOTION TO PERFECT MOTOR VEHICLE OR VESSEL LIEN(S) UNDER SUPPLEMENTARY PROCEEDINGS (AS TO JOSEPH ROBINSON, JR ONLY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EX PARTE VERIFIED MOTION FOR ORDER TO PERFECT MOTOR VEHICLE OR VESSEL LIEN(S) UNDER SUPPLEMENTARY PROCEEDINGS (AS TO JOSEPH ROBINSON, JR ONLY) (REOPEN)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX POST JUDGMENT; ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF JOHN F HAYTER, ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCase Reopened this date 1/19/2022; (ON MOTION FOR VEHICLE LIEN & ; MOTION TO TAX COSTS & FEES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCOUNTY REOPEN FEE ($500.01 OR >) Receipt: 480301 Date: 01/24/2022; Amount: $50.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED WRIT OF EXECUTION- ISSUED; (01/03/2022-SRW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION-UNISSUED; (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS NAMES DO NOT MATCH THE COUNTER CLAIM OR FINAL JUDGMENT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DispositionSMALL CLAIM $2,500.01 TO 5,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/25/2021; Disposition: NJ01 - NON-JURY TRIAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO TAX ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DAVID E WILLIAMSON ESQ on behalf of DEFENDANT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT - CLAIMED 05/27/2021; BELLAMAY GRAND APTS (DEFENDANT)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $360.15; Total Fee Paid: $360.15; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470147; Paid: $310.15; Applied: $310.15; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRETRIAL SET FOR - SUMMONS ISSUED; Event: SMALL CLAIM PRETRIALS ; Date: 07/16/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: VAN VORST - DIV V, KRISTINE Location: COURTROOM 2-B; ; Result: HELD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketSUMMONS FEE (34.041(1)(d) COUNTY CIVIL) Receipt: 470147 Date: 05/25/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM - ($2500.01 - $8000) Receipt: 470147 Date: 05/25/2021; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOPIES FEE -(CASE RECEIPTING) NON COURT DOCUMENT Receipt: 470147 Date: 05/25/2021; Amount: $0.15; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Williamson, David Earl