Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/07/2020 at 02:41:11 (UTC).

JOHNSON-CLARK, ARLESIA -VS- WAL-MART STORES, INC et al

Case Summary

On 12/21/2017 JOHNSON-CLARK, ARLESIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against WAL-MART STORES, INC. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4241

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON-CLARK, ARLESIA

Defendants

WALMART STORES EAST, LP

Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Miami, FL 33242

WAL-MART STORES, INC

Ct Corporation System, 1200 South Pine Island Road

Miami, FL 33242

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALKER ESQ, WILLIE J.

625 West Union St Ste C

Jacksonville, FL 32202

Defendant Attorneys

DORE, DENNIS P

4190 Belfort Road, Suite 450

Jacksonville, FL 32216

BELL ESQ, ANDREW J

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 4190 Belfort Road Suite 450

Jacksonville, FL 32216

 

Court Documents

MAIL RETURNED; WAL-MART STORES, INC (DEFENDANT);

06/04/2019: MAIL RETURNED; WAL-MART STORES, INC (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES

05/21/2019: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES

05/16/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXCLUDE WITNESSES

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE/PROHIBIT USE OF EVIDENCE IDENTIFIED IN DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT

05/16/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE/PROHIBIT USE OF EVIDENCE IDENTIFIED IN DEFENDANT'S PRETRIAL STATEMENT

UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUE TRIAL

05/15/2019: UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CONTINUE TRIAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK JUDICIAL NOTICE

05/07/2019: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF INTENT TO SEEK JUDICIAL NOTICE

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

12/13/2018: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATUS/DISPOSITION MEMO

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DENNIS P. DORE ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WAL MART STORES EAST LP

10/24/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF DENNIS P. DORE ESQUIRE AS COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT WAL MART STORES EAST LP

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

09/20/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

07/25/2018: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/16/2018: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED COMPLAINT

02/14/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 1/12/18; WALMART STORES EAST, LP (DEFENDANT);

01/23/2018: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 1/12/18; WALMART STORES EAST, LP (DEFENDANT);

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DENNIS P DORE ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of WALMART STORES EAST, LP (DEFENDANT)

01/22/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; DENNIS P DORE ESQ (Attorney) on behalf of WALMART STORES EAST, LP (DEFENDANT)

SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; WAL-MART STORES, INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/21/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; WAL-MART STORES, INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/21/2017: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/21/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/21/2017: COMPLAINT Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • DispositionNEG. - OTHER; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/21/2017; Disposition: A. HRG OTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; WAL-MART STORES, INC (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES DISCLOSED ON 5/21/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES LISTED IN DEFENDANT'S SECOND UNTIMELY PRETRIAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRE-TRIAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRIKE WITNESSES LISTED IN DEFENDANT'S SECOND UNTIMELY PRETRIAL STATEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
46 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; WAL-MART STORES, INC (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; WALMART STORES EAST, LP (DEFENDANT);; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF WRITTEN INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDNAT, WAL-MART STORES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF WRITTEN TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES EAST, LP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, WAL-MART STORES, INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 411883 Date: 12/21/2017; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walker, Willie James