This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/09/2020 at 12:42:11 (UTC).

JENKINS, SHELISIA -vs- SMITH, DONALD et al

Case Summary

On 04/17/2018 JENKINS, SHELISIA filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SMITH, DONALD. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1266

  • Filing Date:

    04/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JENKINS, SHELISIA

Defendant

SMITH, DONALD

Alachua, FL 32616

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LASH ESQ, ROBERT A

2770 Nw 43 St Ste A

Gainesville, FL 32606

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REFUND OF RENT

06/18/2018: ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REFUND OF RENT

REQUEST FOR A REFUND OF RENT; DONALD SMITH; (EMAILED J.A. 6/15/2018/CMW)

06/15/2018: REQUEST FOR A REFUND OF RENT; DONALD SMITH; (EMAILED J.A. 6/15/2018/CMW)

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

06/11/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

MAIL RETURNED; DONALD SMITH

05/29/2018: MAIL RETURNED; DONALD SMITH

ANSWER; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

05/25/2018: ANSWER; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

JUDGES NOTES FILED

05/24/2018: JUDGES NOTES FILED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-AMENDED COMPLAINT; AS TO DONALD SMITH

05/23/2018: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING-AMENDED COMPLAINT; AS TO DONALD SMITH

COVER LETTER

05/23/2018: COVER LETTER

AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION, DAMAGES AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE

05/23/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION, DAMAGES AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ACTION FOR EVICTION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

05/22/2018: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S ACTION FOR EVICTION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE AS TO DONALD SMITH ONLY Receipt: 418999 Date: 05/10/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/10/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE AS TO DONALD SMITH ONLY Receipt: 418999 Date: 05/10/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION, DAMAGES AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE; (AMENDED AS TO DROPPING ONE PARTY)

05/10/2018: AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION, DAMAGES AND FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH LEASE; (AMENDED AS TO DROPPING ONE PARTY)

MAIL RETURNED; DEVRON TYSON

05/07/2018: MAIL RETURNED; DEVRON TYSON

ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; 5/3/2018 @ 9:00 AM

04/25/2018: ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON ALL PENDING MOTIONS INCLUDING MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; 5/3/2018 @ 9:00 AM

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/3/2018 @ 9:00 AM

04/24/2018: AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/3/2018 @ 9:00 AM

NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/3/2018 @ 9:30 AM

04/24/2018: NOTICE OF HEARING - 5/3/2018 @ 9:30 AM

MOTION FOR/TO HEARING; DONALD SMITH (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED J.A. 4/20/2018/CMW)

04/20/2018: MOTION FOR/TO HEARING; DONALD SMITH (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED J.A. 4/20/2018/CMW)

ANSWER FOR MONEY OWED; DONALD SMITH (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED J.A. 4/20/2018/CMW)

04/20/2018: ANSWER FOR MONEY OWED; DONALD SMITH (DEFENDANT);; (EMAILED J.A. 4/20/2018/CMW)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/18/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: 99 CLOSED; Status Date: 06/15/2018; Disposition: 99CLOSE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • Docket99 CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR REFUND OF RENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR A REFUND OF RENT; DONALD SMITH; (EMAILED J.A. 6/15/2018/CMW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • DocketCase Reopened this date

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DispositionEVICTION DELINQUENT TENANT; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 04/17/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE (CLOSES)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; DONALD SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; (PLAINTIFF HAS ATTORNEY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCOPIES (CASE RECEIPTING) Receipt: 417942 Date: 04/20/2018; Amount: $6.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • DocketCOPIES (CASE RECEIPTING) Receipt: 417939 Date: 04/20/2018; Amount: $2.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCHANGE OF ADDRESS FORM; DONALD SMITH (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - POSTED 4/20/2018; DEVRON TYSON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON 5/20 SUMMONS - SERVED 4/19/2018; DONALD SMITH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $788.75; Total Fee Paid: $788.75; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 417734; Paid: $205.00; Applied: $205.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: DEVRON TYSON; Receipt: 417734 Date: 04/17/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket5/20 SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: DONALD SMITH; Receipt: 417734 Date: 04/17/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ; Receipt: 417734 Date: 04/17/2018; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LASH ESQ, ROBERT A