Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 12:32:37 (UTC).

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC -vs- NETTLES, SHALARA et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2017 JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NETTLES, SHALARA. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1307

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JEFFERSON CAPITAL SYSTEMS LLC

Defendants

NETTLES, SHALARA

Gainesville, FL 32609

BROWN, SHARON

Gainesville, FL 32609

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DALEY ESQ, SARAH C

5801 Ulmerton Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33760

 

Court Documents

JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

10/11/2019: JUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

NOTICE OF HEARING - 9/26/2019 @ 2:30 PM; ROOM 202; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

08/20/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING - 9/26/2019 @ 2:30 PM; ROOM 202; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

07/16/2019: MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

07/16/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

08/14/2018: ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

07/26/2018: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

ANSWER; SHARON BROWN (DEFENDANT);

05/29/2018: ANSWER; SHARON BROWN (DEFENDANT);

RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS

05/23/2018: RESPONSE TO COURT'S ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS

ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS

05/17/2018: ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS

DEFAULT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS DEFENDANTS FILED A MOTION ON 5/24/2017; PLAINTIFF MAY MOTION COURT FOR DEFAULT - CMW 12/11/2017)

12/11/2017: DEFAULT (CLERK UNABLE TO ENTER AS DEFENDANTS FILED A MOTION ON 5/24/2017; PLAINTIFF MAY MOTION COURT FOR DEFAULT - CMW 12/11/2017)

MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

12/11/2017: MOTION FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT

MOTION FOR MORE TIME TO RESPOND; SHALARA NETTLES & SHARON BROWN; (EMAILED TO JUDGE & J.A. 5/24/2017/CMW)

05/24/2017: MOTION FOR MORE TIME TO RESPOND; SHALARA NETTLES & SHARON BROWN; (EMAILED TO JUDGE & J.A. 5/24/2017/CMW)

RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 5/4/2017; SHALARA NETTLES

05/05/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 5/4/2017; SHALARA NETTLES

RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 5/4/2017; SHARON BROWN

05/05/2017: RETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 5/4/2017; SHARON BROWN

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; SHALARA NETTLES (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/21/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; SHALARA NETTLES (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; SHARON BROWN (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/21/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; SHARON BROWN (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

04/21/2017: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

COMPLAINT Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

04/21/2017: COMPLAINT Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGE'S HEARING NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; (COVERAGE COUNSEL ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING - 9/26/2019 @ 2:30 PM; ROOM 202; ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR JUDICIAL DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; SHARON BROWN (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; SHALARA NETTLES (DEFENDANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SUB.SERVED 5/4/2017; SHALARA NETTLES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 5/4/2017; SHARON BROWN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $320.00; Total Fee Paid: $320.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 400752; Paid: $320.00; Applied: $320.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; SHALARA NETTLES (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE; SHARON BROWN (DEFENDANT); Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 400752 Date: 04/21/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Jefferson Capital Systems LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daley, Sarah C