Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/03/2020 at 18:20:46 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC -vs- PERRY, KWASI

Case Summary

On 05/17/2017 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against PERRY, KWASI. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1594

  • Filing Date:

    05/17/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Defendant

PERRY, KWASI

Spring, TX 77388

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ ESQ, NATHAN A

2637 E Atlantic Blvd, #40524

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

07/28/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE

06/27/2017: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE

ORDER (APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER)

06/08/2017: ORDER (APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER)

COVER LETTER

06/05/2017: COVER LETTER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (WITH PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED) (CLERK DOES NOT FORWARD PROPOSED ORDERS TO JUDGE; PLAINTIFF MUST SUBMIT THEM DIRECTLY TO JUDGE FOR ISSUANCE)

06/01/2017: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (WITH PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED) (CLERK DOES NOT FORWARD PROPOSED ORDERS TO JUDGE; PLAINTIFF MUST SUBMIT THEM DIRECTLY TO JUDGE FOR ISSUANCE)

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: KWASI PERRY; Receipt: 402026 Date: 05/17/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/17/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: KWASI PERRY; Receipt: 402026 Date: 05/17/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

05/17/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 402026 Date: 05/17/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

05/17/2017: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 402026 Date: 05/17/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2017
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 05/17/2017; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER (APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER (WITH PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED) (CLERK DOES NOT FORWARD PROPOSED ORDERS TO JUDGE; PLAINTIFF MUST SUBMIT THEM DIRECTLY TO JUDGE FOR ISSUANCE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 402026; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: KWASI PERRY; Receipt: 402026 Date: 05/17/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 402026 Date: 05/17/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC is a litigant