Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 01:51:46 (UTC).

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC -vs- COWAN, AMANDA M

Case Summary

On 02/21/2018 INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against COWAN, AMANDA M. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0607

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC

Defendant

COWAN, AMANDA M

Williston, FL 32696

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHWARTZ ESQ, NATHAN A

2637 E Atlantic Blvd, #40524

Pompano Beach, FL 33062

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (CLOSED)

04/24/2019: ORDER ON STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (CLOSED)

STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT;

04/10/2019: STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT;

SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 3/22/2019; AMANDA M COWAN

04/02/2019: SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 3/22/2019; AMANDA M COWAN

PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE

03/11/2019: PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE

ALIAS 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: AMANDA M COWAN; Receipt: 428165 Date: 11/02/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/01/2018: ALIAS 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: AMANDA M COWAN; Receipt: 428165 Date: 11/02/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS ; AMANDA M COWAN

08/22/2018: RETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS ; AMANDA M COWAN

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

06/01/2018: ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

05/23/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: AMANDA M COWAN; Receipt: 414886 Date: 02/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/21/2018: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: AMANDA M COWAN; Receipt: 414886 Date: 02/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

COMPLAINT; Receipt: 414886 Date: 02/21/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

02/21/2018: COMPLAINT; Receipt: 414886 Date: 02/21/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 02/21/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT (CLOSED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN ON ALIAS 20-DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 3/22/2019; AMANDA M COWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 428165; Paid: $10.00; Applied: $10.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketALIAS 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: AMANDA M COWAN; Receipt: 428165 Date: 11/02/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRETURN OF NON-SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS ; AMANDA M COWAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $320.00; Total Fee Paid: $320.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 414886; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: AMANDA M COWAN; Receipt: 414886 Date: 02/21/2018; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Receipt: 414886 Date: 02/21/2018; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INVESTMENT RETRIEVERS INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schwartz, Nathan A