This case was last updated from Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County on 02/04/2022 at 08:55:51 (UTC).

INTERMED GROUP INC -VS- KARAS, BRANDON et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 INTERMED GROUP INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARAS, BRANDON. This case was filed in Eighth Circuit Courts - Alachua County, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1013

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INTERMED GROUP INC

Defendants

EIGHT ELEVEN GROUP LLC

Jeff Weiser Registered Agent, 6314 Oxbow Way

Indianapolis, IN 46220

PANITZKE, ZACHARY

Citra, FL 32113

MEDASOURCE

C/O Ryan Flowers, R.A., 4500 Salisbury Rd Ste 350

Jacksonville, FL 32216

KARAS, BRANDON

Alachua, FL 32615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SARELSON ESQ, MATTHEW SETH

Attorney at MATTHEW SETH SARELSON, PA

Matthew Seth Sarelson, Pa, 2100 Ponce De Leon Blvd Ste 1290

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Defendant Attorneys

MARCHMAN ESQ, STEPHANIE

643 Sw 4Th Ave Suite 110

Gainesville, FL 32601

RUSH ESQ, MARIAN B.

11 Se 2 Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

01/28/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF HEARING -02/21/2022 @ 10:30 A.M.

01/28/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING -02/21/2022 @ 10:30 A.M.

DEFENDANT MEDASOURCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

01/19/2022: DEFENDANT MEDASOURCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

DEFENDANT BRANDON KARA'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

01/19/2022: DEFENDANT BRANDON KARA'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/06/2022: ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

01/05/2022: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS' SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/05/2022: DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS' SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

12/22/2021: DEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

PLAINTIFFS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS

12/15/2021: PLAINTIFFS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS

SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; (NO CHANGES AS TO PARTIES)

12/15/2021: SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; (NO CHANGES AS TO PARTIES)

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY DUE TO MEDICAL EMERGENCY

12/09/2021: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY DUE TO MEDICAL EMERGENCY

STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

12/08/2021: STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER

DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL MORE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO HIS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR ASSISTANCE (REOPEN)

12/06/2021: DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS EMERGENCY MOTION TO COMPEL MORE COMPLETE RESPONSES TO HIS REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND REQUEST FOR ASSISTANCE (REOPEN)

HEARING DISPOSITION FORM-9/28/21

12/06/2021: HEARING DISPOSITION FORM-9/28/21

JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

12/03/2021: JOINT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS

12/03/2021: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS

ORDER DENYING, IN PART, AND GRANTING, IN PART, MEDASOURCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

12/01/2021: ORDER DENYING, IN PART, AND GRANTING, IN PART, MEDASOURCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT

ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

11/30/2021: ORDER ADOPTING AND INCORPORATING STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -02/21/2022 @ 10:30 A.M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT MEDASOURCE'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT BRANDON KARA'S MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT III OF PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS' SECOND AMENDED RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFENDANTS' UNOPPOSED JOINT MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT (REOPEN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFFS RE-NOTICE OF TAKING THE VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION OF DEFENDANT BRANDON KARAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; (NO CHANGES AS TO PARTIES)

    Read MoreRead Less
61 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468763; Paid: $30.00; Applied: $30.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PRIVATE PROCESS SERVER (WITH PROPOSED ORDER ATTACHED; PLAINTIFF MUST SUBMIT PROPOSED ORDERS DIRECTLY TO JUDGE PER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - CMW 4/19/2021);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS DEFENDANT'S NAME IN BODY OF SUMMONS DOES NOT MATCH DEFENDANT'S NAME IN CASE STYLE OF COMPLAINT (DBA MISSING); WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECTED SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 4/19/2021); ; Receipt: 468763 Date: 04/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO) FOR CORRECT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE); WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE ; "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 4/19/2021); ; Receipt: 468763 Date: 04/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO) FOR CORRECT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE); WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE ; "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 4/19/2021); ; Receipt: 468763 Date: 04/19/2021; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $450.00; Total Fee Paid: $450.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468549; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Receipt: 468549 Date: 04/13/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Intermed Group Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew S Sarelson Esq