Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 00:13:38 (UTC).

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST -vs- MILLOY TRANSPORT INC

Case Summary

On 12/11/2017 INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MILLOY TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3825

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST

Defendant

MILLOY TRANSPORT INC

C/O Ian B Milloy, R.A., 11112 Nw 70 Cir

Chiefland, FL 32626

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUERDEN ESQ, ANGELA M

111 N Orange Ave Ste 1200

Orlando, FL 32801

 

Court Documents

ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

12/26/2019: ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MILLOY TRANSPORT, INC.

11/22/2019: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MILLOY TRANSPORT, INC.

ORDER ON PLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT STATUS HEARING (GRANTED)

11/14/2019: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT STATUS HEARING (GRANTED)

PLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST'S MOTION ; TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT STATUS HEARING

11/12/2019: PLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST'S MOTION ; TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT STATUS HEARING

DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED 10/31/2019 ; AS TO MILLOY TRANSPORT INC / CMW

10/30/2019: DEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED 10/31/2019 ; AS TO MILLOY TRANSPORT INC / CMW

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

10/30/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 11/15/2019 @ 2:00 PM

10/30/2019: ORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 11/15/2019 @ 2:00 PM

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 8/16/2018; MILLOY TRANSPORT INC

08/21/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 8/16/2018; MILLOY TRANSPORT INC

ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE IN WHICH TO SERVE PROCESS

07/20/2018: ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE IN WHICH TO SERVE PROCESS

MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE IN WHICH TO SERVE PROCESS

07/05/2018: MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE IN WHICH TO SERVE PROCESS

ORDER TO SERVE OR DISMISS

05/16/2018: ORDER TO SERVE OR DISMISS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

02/01/2018: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

01/22/2018: MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MILLOY TRANSPORT, INC. ; Receipt: 411381 Date: 12/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/11/2017: 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MILLOY TRANSPORT, INC. ; Receipt: 411381 Date: 12/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

12/11/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 411381 Date: 12/11/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

12/11/2017: COMPLAINT ; Receipt: 411381 Date: 12/11/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • DispositionCONTRACT AND INDEBTEDNESS $5,000.01 TO $15,000.00; Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 12/11/2017; Disposition: DJ01 - JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT MILLOY TRANSPORT, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON PLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST'S MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT STATUS HEARING (GRANTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST'S MOTION ; TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY AT STATUS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT BY CLERK ENTERED 10/31/2019 ; AS TO MILLOY TRANSPORT INC / CMW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO ADVISE OF STATUS; CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE - 11/15/2019 @ 2:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 20 DAY SUMMONS - SERVED 8/16/2018; MILLOY TRANSPORT INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE IN WHICH TO SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE IN WHICH TO SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SERVE OR DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $310.00; Total Fee Paid: $310.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • FinancialReceipt # 411381; Paid: $310.00; Applied: $310.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: MILLOY TRANSPORT, INC. ; Receipt: 411381 Date: 12/11/2017; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT ; Receipt: 411381 Date: 12/11/2017; Amount: $300.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INSURANCE COMPANY OF THE WEST is a litigant