Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 05/10/2021 at 16:09:12 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: SABIN, CLAUDIA BALL

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 IN THE ESTATE OF SABIN, CLAUDIA BALL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0858

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Applicant

SABIN, PETER BOWMAN

Berkley, CA 94708

Decedent

SABIN, CLAUDIA BALL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

KNEPPER, KATHRYN H

5618 Nw 43Rd Street

Gainesville, FL 32653

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - AMANDA SABIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • Docket(ORIGINAL) LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL ORIGINALLY DEPOSITED ON 2/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER ORIGINALLY FILED ON 2/22/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $345.00; Total Fee Paid: $345.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468493; Paid: $345.00; Applied: $345.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - PETER BOWMAN SABIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION (> $1000.00) Receipt: 468493 Date: 04/12/2021; Amount: $345.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • Docket(E-REDACTED) CERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNEPPER, KATHRYN H