This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 22:50:35 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: RICE, RUSSELL JOHN REP: PEREZ, MELISSA

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 IN THE ESTATE OF RICE, RUSSELL JOHN REP PEREZ, MELISSA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1221

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

RICE, RUSSELL JOHN

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

PEREZ, MELISSA

Miami, FL 33176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MACK ESQ., STEPHANIE

4001 W Newberry Rd Ste A-1

Gainesville, FL 32607

Not Yet Classified Attorney

MACK ESQ, STEPHANIE N

4001 West Newberry Rd Suite A-1

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY FILED ON ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ADMITTED TO PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPT. P/R, REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPT OF P/R AND WAIVER NOTICE, BOND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • Docket(ORIGINAL) LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 470278; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING: E-FILED LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL Receipt: 470278 Date: 05/26/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketOATH OF P/R,DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketWAIVER OF PRIORITY, CONSENT TO APPT OF P/R AND WAIVER NOTICE, BOND - KRISTA HALL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACK ESQ., STEPHANIE