This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/23/2021 at 16:53:52 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: PENN, ROBERT F REP: LANE, H THOMAS

Case Summary

On 03/12/2021 IN THE ESTATE OF PENN, ROBERT F REP LANE, H THOMAS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0602

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

PENN, ROBERT F

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

LANE, H THOMAS

Gainesville, FL 32608

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

BRASHEAR ESQUIRE, BRUCE

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 925 Nw 56 Terr Suite C

Gainesville, FL 32605

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF 5,880.78 BY NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (EMAILED TO BRASHEAR ESQ., BRUCE, 5/26/2021 - LH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ADMITTED TO PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPT. P/R, REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE ORIGINALLY FILED ON 3/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketOATH OF P/R,DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467315; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL ORIGINALLY DEPOSITED ON 3/11/2021;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL Receipt: 467315 Date: 03/12/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRASHEAR ESQ, BRUCE