This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/12/2020 at 14:16:07 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: JONES, PEARLIE MAE DAVIS

Case Summary

On 10/05/2018 IN THE ESTATE OF JONES, PEARLIE MAE DAVIS was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2186

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

JONES, PEARLIE MAE DAVIS

Applicant

GORDON, KATHY ANN

Gainesville, FL 32606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

SMITH ESQ, JUDY-ANN

1301 Riverplace Boulevard Suite 800

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • DispositionSUMMARY ADM W/WILL (> $1,000.00); Status: CLOSED; Status Date: 10/05/2018; Disposition: BH01- BEFORE HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketCASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE AND OF SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ADMITTED TO PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • DocketORDER DETERMINING HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD STATUS OF REAL PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - LILLIAN FAITH CROOMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - ANNIE JONES ROLLE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $345.00; Total Fee Paid: $345.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 426866; Paid: $345.00; Applied: $345.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR WILL DATED SEPTEMBER 26, 2003 ORIGIANLLY DEPOSITED ON 9/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Docket(ORIGINAL) LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL - ORIGINALLY DEPOSITED ON 9/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE - ORIGINALLY FILED ON 9/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketCOVER LETTER - ORIGINALLY FILED ON 9/9/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketE-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL (> $1000.00) Receipt: 426866 Date: 10/05/2018; Amount: $345.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH ESQ, JUDY-ANN