Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:04:50 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: GRIFFIN, GERALD HUBERT

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 IN THE ESTATE OF GRIFFIN, GERALD HUBERT was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0681

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Applicant

LANGLEY, ARBUTUS

Hawthorne, FL 32640

Decedent

GRIFFIN, GERALD HUBERT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant Attorney

MACK ESQ., STEPHANIE

4001 W Newberry Rd Ste A-1

Gainesville, FL 32607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF 939.00 BY NORTH FLORIDA REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER (EMAILED TO MACK ESQ, STEPHANIE, 4/16/21 - LH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • DocketSTATE OF MARYLAND EXEMPLIFIED COPIES OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketSTATE OF MARYLAND EXEMPLIFIED COPIES OF PROCEEDINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING EXEMPLIFIED COPIES OF PROCEEDINGS IN THE PENDING DOMICILIARY ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467631; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ANCILLARY ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT A WILL Receipt: 467631 Date: 03/22/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOATH OF P/R,DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACK ESQ., STEPHANIE