This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 07:21:44 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: DESJARDIN, GERTRUDE E REP: WHITNEY, JULIE E

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 IN THE ESTATE OF DESJARDIN, GERTRUDE E REP WHITNEY, JULIE E was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0926

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

DESJARDIN, GERTRUDE E

Not Yet Classified and Applicant

WHITNEY, JULIE E

Earleton, FL 32631

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Applicant Attorney

CIESLA, LARRY E.

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 4400 Nw 23 Ave Ste A

Gainesville, FL 32606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF INVENTORY - KAREN L. DESJARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF INVENTORY - LUCY E. DESJARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT OF COPY OF INVENTORY - THERESE A. DESJARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY FILED ON ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY FILED ON ESTATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - KAREN L. DESJARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - THERESE A. DESJARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketRECEIPT OF BENEFICIARY - LAURIE J. DESJARDIN

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPT. P/R, REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • Docket(ORIGINAL) LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketCOVER LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 468794; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOATH OF P/R,DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL Receipt: 468794 Date: 04/20/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • Docket(E-FILED) LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CIESLA, LARRY E.