This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/13/2020 at 15:26:13 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: COOPER, VONDELL

Case Summary

On 12/05/2018 IN THE ESTATE OF COOPER, VONDELL was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2630

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

COOPER, VONDELL

Not Yet Classified

COOPER, NIA RENE'E

Newberry, FL 32669

Applicant

COOPER, MONIQUE

Phoenix, AZ 85045

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

SMITH ESQ, JUDY-ANN

1301 Riverplace Boulevard Suite 800

Jacksonville, FL 32207

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM CYNTHIA COOPER TO JUDGE FERRERO; (EMAILED TO STAFF ATTORNEY 080619 MAT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO VACATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • DocketMAIL RETURNED; MONIQUE COOPER (APPLICANT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • DocketORDER TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF $325.98 BY FLORIDA POWER AND LIGHT (COPY EMAILED TO DAVID ESQ, CHARLES M, 5/28/19 - CLS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketVERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR SALE AND PARTITION AND AN ACCOUNTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketPROOF OF ATTEMPTED SERVICE OF FORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF OR TO FREEZE ASSETS PENDING DETERMINATION OF RIGHTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE ON AGENCY FOR HEALTHCARE ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • FinancialReceipt # 429770; Paid: $345.00; Applied: $345.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $345.00; Total Fee Paid: $345.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE HOMESTEAD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - DONNIE VONDELL COOPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketPETITION TO DETERMINE EXEMPT PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF HEIRS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • DocketPETITION FOR SUMMARY ADMINISTRATION WITHOUT WILL (> $1000.00) Receipt: 429770 Date: 12/06/2018; Amount: $345.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH ESQ, JUDY-ANN