This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 08/24/2021 at 18:23:39 (UTC).

IN THE ESTATE OF: BRYAN, DORA LEE REP: MANALLI, SUSAN

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 IN THE ESTATE OF BRYAN, DORA LEE REP MANALLI, SUSAN was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1125

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Decedent

BRYAN, DORA LEE

Applicant and Not Yet Classified

MANALLI, SUSAN

Anderson, SC 29621

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Applicant and Not Yet Classified Attorney

KNEPPER, KATHRYN H

5618 Nw 43Rd Street

Gainesville, FL 32653

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM IN THE AMOUNT OF 600.59 BY SHANDS TEACHING HOSPITAL AND CLINICS, INC. (EMAILED TO KNEPPER, KATHRYN H., 7/2/21 - LH)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLAST WILL AND TESTAMENT (ADMITTED TO PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL TO PROBATE & APPT. P/R, REFERRAL TO MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • Docket(ORIGINAL) LAST WILL AND TESTAMENT WITHOUT CODICIL ORIGINALLY DEPOSITED ON 4/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF DEATH ORIGINALLY FILED ON 4/30/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - TOBY S. MONACO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 469792; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - DENNIS BRUCE SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NO FLORIDA ESTATE TAX DUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ADMINISTRATION WITH WILL Receipt: 469792 Date: 05/17/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketOATH OF P/R,DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - SUSAN MANALLI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF DEATH CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE - CARL T. SMITH A/K/A TOM SMITH

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KNEPPER, KATHRYN H