Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 04/19/2021 at 16:01:28 (UTC).

IN RE: THE NAME CHANGE OF: FERGUSON, MERCELLO DIOVIONNE NEW NAME STONE, MERCELLO DIOVIONNE

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 IN RE THE NAME CHANGE OF FERGUSON, MERCELLO DIOVIONNE NEW NAME STONE, MERCELLO DIOVIONNE was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is GROEB, ROBERT K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0780

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

GROEB, ROBERT K

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

FERGUSON, MERCELLO DIOVIONNE

Gainesville, FL 32608

STONE, MERCELLO DIOVIONNE

Gainesville, FL 32608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • HearingPRO SE HEARINGS; Judge: GROEB, ROBERT K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING HEARING BY VIDEO CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketCOURT EVENT SET - (NO IMAGE AVAILABLE); Event: PRO SE HEARINGS ; Date: 05/05/2021 Time: 9:00 am ; Judge: GROEB, ROBERT K Location: COURTROOM 3-B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL FDLE REPORT (FOR CLERK AND JUDICIARY ONLY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 467591; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFINGERPRINT CONFIRMATION AUTHORIZATION CODE FOR PETITIONERS; MERCELLO DIOVIONNE FERGUSON (OLD NAME);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES; MERCELLO DIOVIONNE STONE (NEW NAME);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET; MERCELLO DIOVIONNE FERGUSON (OLD NAME);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME Receipt: 467591 Date: 03/22/2021; MERCELLO DIOVIONNE FERGUSON (OLD NAME);; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less