This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 02:10:33 (UTC).

IN RE: THE NAME CHANGE OF: BOYER, WINIFRED DIANNE NEW NAME DIROCCO, DIANNE BOYER

Case Summary

On 06/16/2021 IN RE THE NAME CHANGE OF BOYER, WINIFRED DIANNE NEW NAME DIROCCO, DIANNE BOYER was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1647

  • Filing Date:

    06/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

BOYER, WINIFRED DIANNE

DIROCCO, WINIFRED DIANNE

DIROCCO, DIANNE BOYER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

WELLER, THOMAS R

18731 Nw Us Hwy 441

High Springs, FL 32643

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL FDLE REPORT (FOR CLERK AND JUDICIARY ONLY); (TRANSACTION REJECTED BY FBI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketCONFIDENTIAL FDLE REPORT (FOR CLERK AND JUDICIARY ONLY); (TRANSACTION REJECTED BY FBI)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S DETERMINATION THAT DESIGNATED INFORMATION IS NOT CONFIDENTIAL PER RULE 2.420 (d) (2); ; NOTICE - Confidential - Not - Determination; Sent on: 06/23/2021 11:37:51.08

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL ; INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt # 471135; Paid: $400.00; Applied: $400.00; Refunded: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $400.00; Total Fee Paid: $400.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF NAME ; Receipt: 471135 Date: 06/17/2021; Amount: $400.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketFAMILY COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WELLER, THOMAS RAY