Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Alachua County Courts on 03/25/2021 at 16:06:26 (UTC).

IN RE: HAMILTON, RONALD /PETITIONER: NORTH FLORIDA EVALUATION & TREATMENT CENTER

Case Summary

On 02/25/2021 IN RE HAMILTON, RONALD /PETITIONER NORTH FLORIDA EVALUATION TREATMENT CENTER was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Alachua County Courts, Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0458

  • Filing Date:

    02/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Alachua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alachua County Family / Civil Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Alachua, Florida

 

Party Details

Petitioner

NORTH FLORIDA EVALUATION & TREATMENT CENTER

1200 Ne 55 Blvd

Gainesville, FL 32641

Respondent

HAMILTON, RONALD

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

O'BRIEN, RACHAEL

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Respondent Attorney

DEFENDER, PUBLIC

151 Sw 2Nd Ave

Gainesville, FL 32601

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING TREATMENT AND ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketREPORT AND RECOMMENDATION OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketRETURN OF SERVICE ON ORDER - SERVED 03/09/2021; RONALD HAMILTON (RESPONDENT);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING ON PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING TREATMENT AND ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR ORDER AUTH. TREAT. UNDER F.S.916.107(3)(A);

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING -

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTH FLORIDA EVALUATION & TREATMENT CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'BRIEN, RACHAEL