This case was last updated from Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/03/2023 at 07:16:46 (UTC).

HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC -vs- SMOAKS, DASHA

Case Summary

On 11/10/2022 HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SMOAKS, DASHA. This case was filed in Alachua County - Eighth Judicial Circuit Court, Alachua County Criminal Justice Center located in Alachua, Florida. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4197

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC

Defendant

SMOAKS, DASHA

Gainesville, FL 32601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSE JR., CHARLES

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

Attorney At Law, 500 N.E. 8Th Avenue

Ocala, FL 34470

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493223 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493223 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

11/10/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 493223 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

11/10/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 493223 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

SHERIFF'S RETURN POSTED 11/16/2022; DASHA SMOAKS (DEFENDANT);

11/18/2022: SHERIFF'S RETURN POSTED 11/16/2022; DASHA SMOAKS (DEFENDANT);

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

11/23/2022: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK 12/12/22 KCA

12/12/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK 12/12/22 KCA

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/19/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT ISSUED BY CLERK 12/12/22 KCA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING COPY OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSHERIFF'S RETURN POSTED 11/16/2022; DASHA SMOAKS (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialTotal Fee Owed: $195.00; Total Fee Paid: $195.00; Total Fee Dismissed: $0.00; Total Fee Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt #: 493223; Paid: 493223; Applied: $195.00; Refunded: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED WITH FEE Receipt: 493223 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $10.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET - NO JURY TRIAL REQUESTED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FOR EVICTION - NO MONEY CLAIM Receipt: 493223 Date: 11/10/2022; Amount: $185.00; Amount Due: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HORIZON SUNSET APARTMENTS LLC is a litigant